This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2023 at 15:06:15 (UTC).

REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC vs. Eloy Villanueva

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eloy Villanueva. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9086

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC

24165 Ih-10 West Ste 217-418

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant

Villanueva, Eloy

Saginaw, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carolyn J. Noack

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO EFILING@PCPUSA.NET & 106@PCPUSA.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: 106@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-624: REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less