This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2023 at 16:08:00 (UTC).

REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC vs. Andrea Alfaro

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Andrea Alfaro. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9088

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC

24165 Ih-10 West Ste 217-418

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant

Alfaro, Andrea

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carolyn J. Noack

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 2/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-626: REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff REPUBLIC FINANCE, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less