Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/11/2017 at 23:52:59 (UTC).

REGIONAL FINANCE CORP OF TEXAS vs. BUFFORD WARREN, JR

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 REGIONAL FINANCE CORP OF TEXAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUFFORD WARREN, JR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5322

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONAL FINANCE CORP OF TEXAS

6242 Rufe Snow Dr #230

Nrh, TX 76148

Defendant

WARREN, BUFFORD, JR

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $1,265.67; Awarded To: REGIONAL FINANCE CORP OF TEXAS; Awarded Against: BUFFORD WARREN; Comment: $1,265.67 + CT COSTS @ 5% POST-JUDGMENT INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFN ALONG WITH JUDGMENT./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Order Entered on Case: AT TIME OF PROVE UP HEARING, PRO SE PLTF APPEARED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,265.67 + COURT COSTS @ 5% POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Prove Up Hearings: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • Hearing Letter Mailed: HEARING LETTER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF PROVE UP HEARING SET FOR 12/6/17 AT 9:30 IN HURST. AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Letter Received by the Court: FROM PLTF REQUESTING THAT THIS CASE BE SET FOR PROVE UP. PLACED IN PROVE UP BIN. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Letter Issued: TO DEFENDANT. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED BY ALTERNATE SERVICE ON 9/29/17 AT 3:02 PM AT 4401 CAMPION LN FORT WORTH, TX 76137. AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. MAILED TO CO1 FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • CITATION: WARREN, BUFFORD, JR: Served: 09/29/2017; Returned: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Comments: CITATION ISSUED AND MAILED TO CO1 FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed: WITH PETN./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-03367: REGIONAL FINANCE CORP. #556: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff REGIONAL FINANCE CORP OF TEXAS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less