Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/02/2021 at 10:00:58 (UTC).

Quench USA, Inc. vs Gibbons TX Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Quench USA, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gibbons TX Management, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********40-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quench USA, Inc.

630 Allendale Rd Ste 200

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Defendants

Gibbons TX Management, LLC

1112 Gibbins Rd

Arlington, TX 76011

d/b/a Heritage Oaks

Arlington, TX 76011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Heath Coffman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-161605: Quench USA, Inc.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution: mailed to atty 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Writ of Execution Index #11: Application for Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Index #10: mailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-160521: Quench USA, Inc.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #9: request for abstract of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index #7: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-158426: Quench USA, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Quench USA, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mail to Attorney Office 02/18/2020; Gibbons TX Management, LLC: Served: 02/28/2020; Returned: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gibbons TX Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where QUENCH USA INC FKA PURE HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Heath Coffman