This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 17:48:30 (UTC).

QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC vs. SHUNTELLIA JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHUNTELLIA JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3702

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC

Defendant

JONES, SHUNTELLIA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $898.33; Awarded To: QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC; Awarded Against: SHUNTELLIA JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketComments: REAL PROPERTY RET'D TO RIGHTFUL OWNER BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: JONES, SHUNTELLIA L: Served: 11/24/2015; Returned: 11/24/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: OF $898.33 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketComments: CITATION RETN EXE TO S. JONES CRT DTE 11/05/2015@8:30AM..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: JONES, SHUNTELLIA L: Served: 10/27/2015; Returned: 10/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04171: QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-03712: QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENTS - ATLANTIC HOUSING FOUNDATION, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUAIL RIDGE APARTMENT, LLC ATLANTIC HOUSING MANAGEMENT is a litigant