This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/24/2021 at 08:50:04 (UTC).

Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange, A/S/O Roberta and Lester De Asis vs Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine, Baylor Scott & White Holdings

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange, A/S/O Roberta and Lester De Asis filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine, Baylor Scott White Holdings. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********90-3

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange

A/S/O Roberta and Lester De Asis

Defendants

Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine

211E. 7Th St., Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

B/S its Reg. Agent, Corporation Service Co. d/b/a CSC-

211 E. 7Th St., Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

211 E. 7Th St., Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

Baylor Scott & White Holdings

211 E. 7Th St., Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Vigushin

Defendant Attorney

Jordan M. Parker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175631: Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketJury Request Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Return of Service - Baylor Regional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service - Baylor Scott & White Holdings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175074: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange: (262.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCitation: eserve to attorney QC complete 08-30-21. VS-; Baylor Regional Medical Center at Grapevine: Served: 08/13/2021; Returned: 08/17/2021; Baylor Scott & White Holdings: Served: 08/13/2021; Returned: 08/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Request for Issuance of Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWYERS INCORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYLOR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AT GRAPEVINE is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Vigushin