Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/04/2017 at 17:20:53 (UTC).

PRICILLA FLEMING vs TAUHEEDAH BILAL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2013 PRICILLA FLEMING filed an Other lawsuit against TAUHEEDAH BILAL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wright, Jacquelyn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9408

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wright, Jacquelyn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEMING, PRICILLA

Defendants

BILAL, TAUHEEDAH

Ft. Worth, TX 76133

HAMILTON, JIMMY

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD E HOOD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2015
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Wright, Jacquelyn) ; Judgment of $6,265.62; Awarded To: PRICILLA FLEMING; Awarded Against: TAUHEEDAH BILAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • Default Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Jacquelyn) : Result: Judgment: NOTICES MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Order of Dismissal/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only: - JIMMY HAMILTON, ONLY. ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Motion to Dismiss/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only Filed: - JIMMY HAMILTON, ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Comments: defn Tauheedah Bilal notice returned by po.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Comments: DEFN JIMMY HAMILTON NOTICE RETURNED BY PO.ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Comments: PLTFS ATTY IS REQUESTING THIS CASE BE SET FOR PROVE UP HEARING ON DEFN, TAUHEEDAH BILAL. THE RETURN IS QUESTIONABLE. GAVE THE FILE TO THE JUDGE TO REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Answer Due On: (TAUHEEDAH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • CITATION: BILAL, TAUHEEDAH: Served: 05/09/2013; Returned: 05/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Order Approving Service by Rule 536 Entered: - TAUHEEDAH BILAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Motion for Service by Rule 536 Filed: - TAUHEEDAH BILAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Answer Filed: - JIMMY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2013
  • CITATION: HAMILTON, JIMMY: Served: 02/22/2013: Response Received: 02/25/2013; Returned: 02/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2013
  • CITATION: BILAL, TAUHEEDAH: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2013
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP4-2013-788: HOOD, DONALD E: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff FLEMING, PRICILLA; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/04/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald E. Hood