This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/03/2023 at 23:02:09 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. William P Beaty

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against William P Beaty. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8239

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Beaty, William P

Fort Worth, TX 76108-1427

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila Boozer Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: txefile@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-5110: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (36.75)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 57.75; Total Payments and Credits: 57.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 57.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less