This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/29/2020 at 07:35:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. TONYA S NORRIS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TONYA S NORRIS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6918

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

NORRIS, TONYA S

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Thomas Jones

Defendant Attorney

Tom M Thomas, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $6,470.09; Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: TONYA NORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Rule 11 Agreement Pending/Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketAgreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2018-03955: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCITATION: NORRIS, TONYA S: Served: 10/01/2018; Returned: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less