This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/15/2022 at 16:24:28 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Sarah A Boswell

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sarah A Boswell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8817

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Boswell, Sarah A

Euless, TX 76039-3911

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Defendant Attorney

Dena Gayle Weaver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. SET FOR MEDIATION ON 11/10/22 @ 9:00AM IN HURST. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $86.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN'S ATTY VIA EFILE. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 8/2/22 AT 7:14PM. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-03018: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Boswell, Sarah A: Served: 08/02/2022; Returned: 08/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: TO PPS FOR SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang