This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/28/2023 at 08:00:29 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Rhonda Henderson

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rhonda Henderson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8083

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Henderson, Rhonda

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tarlicia L. Armstead

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-01127: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Henderson, Rhonda: Served: 02/28/2023; Returned: 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less