This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/01/2019 at 05:03:00 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Randolph Duke

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Randolph Duke. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayes, Matt and Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9910

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Hayes, Matt

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Duke, Randolph

Arlington, TX 76015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Garza

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W WESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $2,934.38; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Awarded Against: Randolph Duke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $2934.38 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: SET FOR TRIAL 90 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Agreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Letter Received by the Court: FROM DEFN'S ATTY VIA FAX REQUESTING COPY OF ORIGINAL PETITION BE FAXED TO 866-579-6411, COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Motion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed: TO BE HEARD AT PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice of Appearance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Duke, Randolph: Served: 10/08/2018; Returned: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07469: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less