This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 10:17:17 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Phillip Lambert, Ann M Lambert

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Phillip Lambert, Ann M Lambert. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********39-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendants

Lambert, Ann M

Fort Worth, TX 76133-7957

or at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Lambert, Phillip

Fort Worth, TX 76133-7957

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 7: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 5: for Ann M. Lambert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 4: for Phillip Lambert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-183068: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: (229.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC LEGAL; Lambert, Phillip: Unserved ; Lambert, Ann M: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang