This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/17/2022 at 09:10:14 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Patricia Allen

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Patricia Allen. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2150

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Allen, Patricia

Watauga, TX 76137-4742

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Mackenszie Wallace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ORDER//EFILED// ON BOTH METHODS/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: 1ST REQUEST//EFILED//EMAIL TO: RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED ABC LEGAL//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-04139: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/EMAILED TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Ryan M