This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2023 at 14:04:40 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Nicole Olsen

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nicole Olsen. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8893

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Olsen, Nicole

Fort Worth, TX 76114-4545

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCover Letter Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - "Unable to Locate":

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-209: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (34.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 55.50; Total Payments and Credits: 55.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less