This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/23/2018 at 22:32:51 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Nandranie Mohamed

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nandranie Mohamed. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9906

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Mohamed, Nandranie

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Thomas Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • Dispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Comments: PER JUDGE, NO ACTION TAKEN BY COURT, NO REQUEST MADE BY DEFN IN LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Letter Received by the Court: FROM DEFN CONCERNING WHY DEFN DID NOT APPEAR AT COURT THIS MORNING, FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Order of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered: NO PARTIES APPEARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Defendant Contacted Court: ASKED WHEN COURT DATE IS AND IF SHE HAD TO BE THERE; ADVISED IF SHE DOESN'T APPEAR, HER SIDE WILL NOT BE HEARD; SAID SHE DIDN'T KNOW IF SHE COULD GET OFF WORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Mohamed, Nandranie: Served: 10/01/2018; Returned: 10/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07463: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less