This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/27/2023 at 02:03:49 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Monica Alvarez

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Monica Alvarez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8151

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Defendant

Alvarez, Monica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Judgment of $1,294.14; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Awarded Against: Monica Alvarez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEmailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Alvarez, Monica: Served: 03/04/2023; Returned: 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED MJSCOURTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-00876: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (36.25)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 57.25; Total Payments and Credits: 57.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 57.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less