This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/20/2019 at 04:37:34 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. MAUREEN JONES

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAUREEN JONES. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9177

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

JONES, MAUREEN

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Dow Lockhart

Defendant Attorney

Michael R. Lewis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Mediation; (12:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement Filed: Notice of Settlement/ EFILE/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only; 12/26/2018; Reset by Court to 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Letter Issued: TO BOTH PARTIES / PTM SET FOR 2/5/19 AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Answer Filed: BY ATTY//VIA EFILE.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Answer Due On: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Affidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Emailed: CITN AND PETN TO EZ MESSENGER// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: EMAILED EZ MESSENGER// LR; JONES, MAUREEN: Served: 10/13/2018; Returned: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: 4941756 Jones Petition//EMAIL CTN TO: efiletx@ezmessenger.com //DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2018-03187: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less