This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2023 at 13:04:07 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Mary May

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary May. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9836

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

May, Mary

Roanoke, TX 76262

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shelby L. Mashigian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOrder Denying Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO PPS. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOrder Denying Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY ABC LEGALVIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder Denying Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. COPY EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY ABC LEGAL. PRESENTED TO JUDGE/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY ABC LEGAL. PRESENTED TO JUDGE/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCITATION: May, Mary: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00220: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less