This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/06/2022 at 18:01:53 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Martin Ruiz

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Martin Ruiz. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8028

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Ruiz, Martin

Fort Worth, TX 76108-4721

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Mackenszie Wallace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEmailed: COPY OF DEF JM | MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: MOTION FOR DJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketLetter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: srv'd on 10/01/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-4563: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: (34.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 55.50; Total Payments and Credits: 55.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Ryan M