This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/29/2019 at 22:53:59 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Maria Martinez

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Martinez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9909

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Martinez, Maria

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Thomas Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Dispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Order of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Order to Retain Granted: 60 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice: order granting motion to retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion to Retain Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Letter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Martinez, Maria: Served: 10/06/2018; Returned: 10/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07468: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less