This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/20/2023 at 18:01:41 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Lori Berry

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lori Berry. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0150

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Berry, Lori

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. MEDIATION SET FOR 6/15/23 AT 9:00AM. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY CERT MAIL IN SL. DEFN'S ADDRESS UPDATED. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFND - COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC/LEGAL/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: IN PERSON ON 3/6/23 @ 112 PM BY ABC/LEGAL/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00997: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Berry, Lori: Served: 03/06/2023; Returned: 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED ABC/LEGAL FOR SERVICE/TLH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PORTFOLIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less