This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/21/2023 at 07:05:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. LEONARD PISTONE, III

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEONARD PISTONE, III. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9937

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

PISTONE, LEONARD, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ LOP: (8:30 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CORRECTION: LOP NOTICE TO PLTF TODAY 4/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketEmailed: LOP NOTICE TO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: PURSUANT TO TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE: 503.1 & 508.3; DUE TO DEFENDANT FAILING TO FILE AN ANSWER, PLEASE READ RULES AND SUBMIT PROPER DOCUMENTS OR REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED PPS ON 03/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: to mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCITATION: PISTONE, LEONARD, III: Served: 03/21/2023; Returned: 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED AS REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2023-01515: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less