This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/15/2018 at 22:31:17 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Latisha Owens

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Latisha Owens. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9903

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Owens, Latisha

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Garza

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Order of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Proposed Order: Order Granting Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice: Notice Of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Letter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: CITATION WAS RETURNED BAD ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Citation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Owens, Latisha: Returned Unserved 10/05/2018; Returned: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07459: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less