This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/26/2023 at 19:30:22 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Karen Walker

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karen Walker. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8134

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Walker, Karen

Crowley, TX 76036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Strain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED MJSCOURTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED MJSCOURTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Walker, Karen: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-00809: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (35.75)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 56.75; Total Payments and Credits: 56.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 56.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less