Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 11:58:23 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. KAREN ODELL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAREN ODELL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2902

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ODELL, KAREN

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComments: 90 DAYS WITH NO ACTIVITY. CASE TO BE SET FOR DWOP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM EZ MESSENGER/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On: PAST DUE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 8-15-20 AT 12:00 PM BY EZ MESSENGER/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCITATION: ODELL, KAREN: Served: 08/15/2020; Returned: 09/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND MAILED TO EZ MESSENGER IN SASE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2020-02514: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: 5676020 ODELL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang