This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/16/2023 at 18:04:57 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Julie Layman

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Julie Layman. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3718

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Defendant

Layman, Julie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $542.54; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Awarded Against: Julie Layman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF ATTY//SET FOR DWOP 6/16/23//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: SET FOR 6/16/2023 @ 1PM// EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY//HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCourt Notes: PLTF ATTY APPEARED//PER PRESIDING JUDGE C. RUCKEL, RESET 30 DAYS//HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDWOP Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: DUE TO INACTIVITY SET FOR 05.12.2023 @ 9:00AM EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY//FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CITN AND PETN TO PPS//.MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-00843: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less