This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2023 at 13:04:12 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Jose Carrillo

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Carrillo. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9837

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Carrillo, Jose

Keller, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shelby L. Mashigian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 2/3/23 @ 7:02PM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Carrillo, Jose: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00221: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less