This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/16/2021 at 12:37:07 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Heather Springs

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Heather Springs. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2982

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Springs, Heather

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marion Nicole Phillips

Michael J. Scott

Thomas Wade Stephens

Mathew Phillip Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $5,903.04; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Awarded Against: Heather Springs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: EMAILED TO P ATTY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMailed: MAILED DEFAULT TO DEF AT ADDRESS ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiffs' Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: PLTF/ATTY - COPY OF NOTICE OF PRETRIAL, MOTION FOR DEF JM & ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed: pltf and mailed defn pretrial notice w zoon info

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: via email - she put her apt # as 202 pltf had is as 20 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: CIT SRVD ON DEF ON 1/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCITATION: Springs, Heather: Served: 01/01/2021; Returned: 01/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: e-mail to ABC at mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2020-5627: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: S&A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Michael J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew P Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens