This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/30/2022 at 10:05:04 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Gina Boyd

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gina Boyd. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2144

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Boyd, Gina

Fort Worth, TX 76177

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Mackenszie Wallace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: EFILED/NO FURTHER ACTION/DEFN FILED ANSWER 08.22.22//CASE WILL PROCEED TO PTM//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: EFILED/BY PLTF ATTY/NO FURTHER ACTION/DEFN FILED ANSWER 08.22.22//CASE WILL PROCEED TO PTM//HG //FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketMailed: TO DEFN// TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 11/09/2022 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: REQUEST FOR UPDATED CONTACT INFO/ MAILED TO DEFN/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: DEFN ANSWER DOES NOT CONTAIN ANY CONTACT INFORMATION//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: EFILED/PRO SE/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED ABC LEGAL//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-04130: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/EMAILED TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Ryan M