This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:36:18 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Ghazanfar Mahmood

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ghazanfar Mahmood. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9828

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Mahmood, Ghazanfar

Colleyville, TX 76034-7630

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $2,068.00; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Awarded Against: Ghazanfar Mahmood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF BY SUBMISSION IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,068.00 + CC WITH 0% INT. COPIES SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY VIA EFILE. MOTION INCLUDES CLKA & MILITARY AFVT. PRESETED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 2/9/23 @ 4:36PM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketOrder Denying Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY ABC LEGAL VIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Mahmood, Ghazanfar: Served: 02/09/2023; Returned: 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00200: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less