This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/29/2023 at 03:15:19 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Franklin Geneville

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Franklin Geneville. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7703

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Geneville, Franklin

Fort Worth, TX 76116-1111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila Boozer Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Judgment of $3,224.38; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Awarded Against: Franklin Geneville

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMailed default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed: Motion for Default judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TXEFILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2022-07192: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (37.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 58.00; Total Payments and Credits: 58.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 58.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEmailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Geneville, Franklin: Served: 11/09/2022; Returned: 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less