This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/30/2022 at 22:34:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. ELENA D BAUCOM

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELENA D BAUCOM. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5757

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

BAUCOM, ELENA D

Grand Prairie, TX 75054-6784

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ LOP: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1 AND 508.3 AND PROVIDE THE PROPER DOCUMENTS OR REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION: BAUCOM, ELENA D: Served: 02/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-00528: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: txefile@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA