This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/23/2023 at 05:01:37 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Daniel Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Daniel Rodriguez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3671

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant

Rodriguez, Daniel

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Strain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketEmailed: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: BY PLTF ATTY//WITH PREJ//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: BY PLTF ATTY//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: ADDED PHONE NUMBER & EMAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFN// TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN PROSE// TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: EMAIL ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: INQ ABOUT FILING AN ANSWER/CLERK GAVE INFORMATION FOR FINDING ANSWER FORM ON WEBSITE/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEmailed: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-00761: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less