This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/27/2023 at 16:05:49 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Dana Dodd

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dana Dodd. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8298

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendant

Dodd, Dana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Defendant Attorney

Kerri Donnally Phillips

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE & ZOOM INFO TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEmailed: ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO TXEFILE@ABCLEGAL.COM; Dodd, Dana: Served: 03/23/2023; Returned: 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-01974: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less