This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2023 at 14:04:36 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Crystal Blackerby

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Crystal Blackerby. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8892

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Blackerby, Crystal

Haslet, TX 76052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan Elliot Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEmailed: COPY OF NON-SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCover Letter Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SVC 1/21/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-208: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (36.25)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 57.25; Total Payments and Credits: 57.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 57.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less