This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/02/2019 at 04:47:14 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Christopher Newton

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher Newton. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9182

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

Newton, Christopher

Haltom City, TX 76148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Dow Lockhart

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Clerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • CANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order to Retain Granted: 60 DAYS AFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Motion to Retain Filed: Plaintiff's Motion To Retain/ EFILE/APG (1ST REQUEST) AFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Letter Issued: CASE SET FOR DWOP HEARING/ SENT TO PLTF//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only; 11/19/2018; Reset by Court to 12/20/2018; 12/26/2018; Reset by Court to 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Letter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Answer Due On: LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Affidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Emailed: CITN AND PETN TO ABC LEGAL// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: EMAILED ABC LEGAL// LR; Newton, Christopher: Served: 10/02/2018; Returned: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition//EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com //DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2018-03192: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less