This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/26/2023 at 15:11:15 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Carissa Cornelius

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Carissa Cornelius. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2592

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Cornelius, Carissa

N Richlnd Hls, TX 76180-1510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamila Boozer Lloyd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDWOP Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: SET FOR APRIL 21, 2023 @ 1:00 PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITTION TO PLTF// TDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEmailed: HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketInactive Letter Mailed/Emailed (inactivity on case): EMAILED TO PLTF//HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEmailed: COPY TO PPS//FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: METHOD 1 APPROVED//FV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: EFILED/EMAIL TO: txefile@abclegal.com/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-05475: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILEDEMAIL TO txefile@abclegal.com//DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less