This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/23/2023 at 17:01:19 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Antonio Valdez

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Antonio Valdez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8891

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Valdez, Antonio

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Strain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: srv'd on 02.04.23 / ALTRN SRV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEmailed: ORDER to ABC at mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-207: Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc: (36.25)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 57.25; Total Payments and Credits: 57.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 57.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less