This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/27/2022 at 01:28:27 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Angel Baker

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angel Baker. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6496

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Baker, Angel

Bedford, TX 76021-5336

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Colby Scherer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $5,544.97; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Awarded Against: Angel Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, $5,544.97 + CC @ 5% INT. EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY. CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS, NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT, BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT, AND BILL OF SALE ATTACHED. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN; COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 8/11/21 AT 6:28PM. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Baker, Angel: Served: 08/11/2021; Returned: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-03653: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): RAUSCH STURM LLP MM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George C. Scherer