This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/16/2023 at 16:25:50 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs. Amer M Hamedi

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Amer M Hamedi. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8568

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Hamedi, Amer M

Fort Worth, TX 76135-9044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:10 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEmailed: EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketBad Address Notification Mailed to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-6025: Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc: (34.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 55.50; Total Payments and Credits: 55.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang