This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/05/2019 at 04:36:14 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / WAL-MART vs. Gordon Davis

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / WAL-MART filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gordon Davis. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9162

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / WAL-MART

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Davis, Gordon

Fort Worth, TX 76120

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSELL RICHARD FAHRA

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • CANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed; 01/31/2019; Reset by Court to 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Order of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: COPY MLD TO PLTF//AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Proposed Order: EFILE AFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit Filed: EFILE AFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice: OF DWOP SET FOR 5/3/19 TO ATTY/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Letter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Emailed: CITN AND PETN TO ABC LEGAL// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: EMAILED ABC LEGAL// LR; Davis, Gordon: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: //EFILED//EMAIL TO: txefile@abclegal.com //DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2018-03170: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank /: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / WAL-MART; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less