This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:35:08 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club vs. Joel Flores

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joel Flores. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9166

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Flores, Joel

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSELL RICHARD FAHRA

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $1,497.42; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club; Awarded Against: Joel Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other; 12/21/2018; Reset by Court to 01/23/2019; 12/26/2018; Reset by Court to 01/29/2019; 01/23/2019; Reset by Court to 02/01/2019; 01/29/2019; Reset by Court to 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Granted: COPIES MLD TO BOTH PARTIES// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/EFILE//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Letter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Answer Due On: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Affidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Emailed: TO ABC LEGAL/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered: RE-ISSUED TO ABC LEGAL/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Proposed Order: EFILED//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: EFILED//EMAIL TO: txefile@abclegal.com //DE/ 1ST REQUEST/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Emailed: CITN AND PETN TO ABC LEGAL// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: EMAILED ABC LEGAL// LR; Flores, Joel: Served: 11/06/2018; Returned: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: //EFILED//EMAIL TO: txefile@abclegal.com //DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2018-03174: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank / Synchrony Bank / Sams Club; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less