This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/20/2019 at 23:27:35 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. / Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Yvette G Lopez

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank USA , N A / Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yvette G Lopez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayes, Matt and Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9933

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Hayes, Matt

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. / Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

Defendant

Lopez, Yvette G

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSELL RICHARD FAHRA

RUSSELL RICHARD FARHA

Defendant Attorney

Jon C. (Kit) Gallini

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $3,925.31; Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. / Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: Yvette Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $3925.31 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Motion For Continuance Filed: REQUEST 90 DAY CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Plaintiff Contacted Court: SAID FAX FROM PREV COMMENT DID NOT TRANSMIT; HAD INCORRECT FAX NUMBER; GAVE CORRECT NUMBER AND HE WILL RE-FAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Comments: CASE CONTINUED 21 DAYS PER JUDGE IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Plaintiff Contacted Court: SAID REACHED SETTLEMENT WITH DEFN; IN PROCESS OF SUBMITTING TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • Comments: SET FOR TRIAL 90 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Answer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Lopez, Yvette G: Served: 10/08/2018; Returned: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07496: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. / Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.: (49.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Assignee Of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. / Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 49.75; Total Payments and Credits: 49.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 49.75

    Read MoreRead Less