Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2017 at 14:35:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS. MATTHEW D DUBLER

Case Summary

On 03/15/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed an Other lawsuit against MATTHEW D DUBLER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0503

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

DUBLER, MATTHEW D

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELVIN THATHIAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2013
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $4,798.28; Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: MATTHEW DUBLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Order Entered on Case: (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B. ) : AT TIME OF PROVE UP HEARING, PLTF'S ATTY APPEARED. DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR PLTF FOR $4798.28 + CT COSTS @ 5% POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST. PLTF'S ATTY GIVEN CONFORMED JUDGMENT IN CT./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Prove Up Hearings: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFN WITH COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT ATTACHED./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Defendant Contacted Court: DEF #1 THAT WAS PREVIOUSLY REMOVED CONTACTED THE COURT. SHE STATED THAT THE DEF MATTHEW DOES NOT LIVE THERE. HE IS IN JAIL. SHE JUST WANTED THE COURT TO BE AWARE. I ADVISED HER THAT SHE COULD SUBMIT SOMETHING IN WRITING STATING THAT BUT THE REASON SHE WAS STILL GETTING NOTICES TO HER HOME WAS BECAUSE THE PLTF'S SUBMITTED ONE ADDRESS AT TIME OF FILING. SHE STATED SHE UNDERSTOOD. HMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • CANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) ; Continuance Granted; 05/17/2013; Reset by Court to 05/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Comments: REC'D ORIGINAL MOTION FOR CONTINUENCE. ALREADY HAS BEEN GRANTED AND RESET. PLACED IN FILE. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Hearing Letter Mailed: PROVE UP HEARING RESET TO 08/02/13 AT 945AM. MAILED NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: MAILED COPY OF SIGNED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Motion For Continuance Filed: BY PLTF ATTY VIA FAX. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. CHC

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2012
  • Citation Returned: SERVED ON DEFN MATHEW D DUBLER. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Comments: MAILED MTN FOR 536 REQUEST FOR SIGNATURE TO PLTF FOR (DEFN SARAH DUBLER). CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Citation Returned: UNSERVED (SARAH DUBLER). REQUEST FOR MTN 536 05/10/12 601AM NO RESPONSE AT DOOR 05/15/12 932PM NO RESPONSE AT DOOR 05/21/12736PM NO RESPONSE AT DOOR 06/02/12 844PM 35YR OLD ANN, A 5;5 135OLBS WHITE FEMALE SAID THAT SARAH DUBLER DOES LIVE HERE BUT NOT HERE AT THIS TIME 06/05/12 436POM. SUBJECT NOT HOME PER 35YR OLD ANN 06/05/12 737PM 106REQUESTED CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Comments: CITN PICKED UP BY PPS FOR SERVICE ~VA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • CITATION: ciation accidentally entered twice; DUBLER, SARAH N: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • CITATION: DUBLER, SARAH N: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • CITATION: DUBLER, MATTHEW D: Served: 05/19/2012; Returned: 06/21/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2012-00914: RAUSCH,STURM,ISRAEL,ENERSON &: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 02/27/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melvin Thathiah