This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 05/16/2023 at 20:01:53 (UTC).

PlainsCapital Bank vs Bank of America, N.A

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 PlainsCapital Bank filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********00-2

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PlainsCapital Bank

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A

B/S Registered Agent, CT Corporation System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew T. Taplett

Defendant Attorney

Evan A. Moeller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketBankruptcy Notice of Dismissal Index # 9: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 8: of Stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: Officers Return - (Duplicate) Bank of America N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Officer's Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketRefund Check Requested Index # 4: Civil Refund

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187495: PlainsCapital Bank: (394.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PlainsCapital Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 531.00; Total Payments and Credits: 531.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 531.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice: Mailed to Attorney 11/16/22; Hall, Brian K.: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney 11/23/22; Bank of America, N.A: Served: 11/23/2022; Returned: 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Post-Judgment Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less