This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/10/2019 at 08:12:41 (UTC).

PEOPLELINK, LLC vs WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 PEOPLELINK, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********95-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLELINK, LLC

Defendants

B/s registered agent, Corporation Service Company

211 E.7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

211 E.7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

211 E.7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN A ISBELL

Defendant Attorney

JAMES H PEARSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Rule 11 Agreement Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice: Mailed to Attorney; LT PLUMBING, LLC: Returned Unserved 03/20/2019; Returned: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Writ of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.: Served: 03/15/2019; Returned: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Original Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Original Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-144331: PEOPLELINK, LLC: (239.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff PEOPLELINK, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 239.00; Total Payments and Credits: 239.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 239.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEOPLELINK, LLC doing business as PEOPLELINK STAFFING SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where d/b/a CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISBELL, JOHN ALLEN