This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 08:49:08 (UTC).

Peoplelink, LLC vs Singleton Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Max Mechanical d/b/a Max Mechanical A/C & Heating

Case Summary

On 02/17/2016 Peoplelink, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Singleton Enterprises, Inc , d/b/a Max Mechanical d/b/a Max Mechanical A/C Heating. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********39-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peoplelink, LLC

Defendant

Singleton Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN A ISBELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#9: Re:Request for Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketJudgment - Default Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketCivil Docket Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Attorney Pick up; Singleton Enterprises, Inc.: Served: 03/03/2016; Returned: 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Doc ID#2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-97072: Peoplelink, LLC: (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-94542: Peoplelink, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-94272: Peoplelink, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-87655: Peoplelink, LLC: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-85398: Peoplelink, LLC: (267.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff Peoplelink, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 285.00; Total Payments and Credits: 285.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 267.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Singleton Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PEOPLELINK, LLC doing business as PEOPLELINK STAFFING SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISBELL, JOHN ALLEN