Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/11/2021 at 10:34:43 (UTC).

PB HOLDINGS III, LLC vs. DANIEL WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 PB HOLDINGS III, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DANIEL WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7230

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PB HOLDINGS III, LLC

805 Central Dr

Bedford, TX 76022

Defendant

WILLIAMS, DANIEL

Bedford, TX 76022

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvict - Judgment for Defendant: PLTF APPEARED BY ZOOM; DEFN APPEARED IN PERSON; JGNT FOR DEFN; NO LEASE OR NOTICE; EMAILED TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerBrandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED BY RULE 510 ON 3/08/21 @ 12:00 PM TO DANIEL WILLIAMS ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: PLTF. ZOOM INFO & INSTRUCTIONS FOR EVIC TRIAL ON 3.23.2021 @ 9:00AM. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: RETURNED TO C03 FOR SRVC ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY C03 FOR SRVC BY RULE 510; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-01095: AVANTI ON CENTRAL APARTMENTS: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PB HOLDINGS III, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: WILLIAMS, DANIEL: Served: 03/08/2021; Returned: 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: WITH DOD ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PB HOLDINGS, III LLC is a litigant