This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 00:44:18 (UTC).

Pavestone, LLC vs Pave Masters, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Pavestone, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pave Masters, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********25-1

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pavestone, LLC

Defendants

Pave Masters, Inc.

232 David Street

Burleson, TX 76028

b/s registered agent, William Bennet,

or its president or any vice-president

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence J. Falli

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCitation: eserved to Attorney; Pave Masters, Inc.: Served: 08/12/2021; Returned: 09/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-174951: Pavestone, LLC: (273.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Pavestone, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 273.00; Total Payments and Credits: 273.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 273.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba Pavestone is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence J. Falli